OR HB4076 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-10)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Task Force on Age Discrimination. Directs task force to identify and evaluate impacts of age discrimination in workplace and report to interim committees relating to business and labor. Sunsets December 31, 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a task force on age discrimination; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-27HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-27HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-26HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2020-02-26HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-25HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2020-02-06HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-06HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-05HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback