OR HB4075 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 57, (2022 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 57, (2022 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies procedures for requesting and ordering restitution in criminal cases. Modifies procedures for requesting and ordering restitution in criminal cases. Requires 50 percent of restitution ordered to insurance carriers to be distributed to Criminal Injuries Compensation Account.] Provides that restitution is Level I obligation for priority of payments on judgments in circuit courts and local courts.
Title
Relating to restitution.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Kropf [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] | Rep. Lily Morgan [R] | Rep. Karin Power [D] |
Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] | Sen. Deb Patterson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Chapter 57, (2022 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2023. |
2022-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Lawrence Spence. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 26; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Carried over to 03-03 by unanimous consent. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Breese-Iverson, Speaker Rayfield. |
2022-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 28, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-02-24 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-21 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-17 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2022-02-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |