OR HB4075 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits person from conducting or participating in contest, competition, tournament or derby that has objective of taking coyotes for cash or prizes. Provides that prohibition does not apply to raffle conducted by nonprofit organization if organization does not award raffle prizes based on number, weight or size of coyotes taken. Punishes violation of prohibition by maximum fine of $2,000. Provides that person violating Act forfeits remains of coyote to State Department of Fish and Wildlife. Declares emergency, effective on passage.].
Title
Relating to wildlife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 16--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Hayden, Lewis, Moore-Green, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Wilson; Excused, 2--Clem, Greenlick. |
2020-02-17 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2020-02-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |