OR HB4074 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 117, (2022 Laws): Effective date April 15, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 117, (2022 Laws): Effective date April 15, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires employee or worker of marijuana licensee to report human trafficking on licensed premises to Oregon Liquor and Cannabis Commission. Requires employee or worker of marijuana licensee to report human trafficking on licensed premises to Oregon Liquor and Cannabis Commission. Directs commission to establish human trafficking coordinator position.] Directs State Department of Agriculture to require any rebuttal testing of cannabis to be performed by department staff member in department-operated laboratory. Includes community-based organizations as eligible entities to receive financial assistance from Illegal Marijuana Market Enforcement Grant Program in order to address ongoing humanitarian crisis associated with unlawful marijuana cultivation or distribution operations. Repeals sunset of Illegal Marijuana Market Enforcement Grant Program. Becomes operative on passage. Authorizes commission to allow certain licensed marijuana retailers to relocate to other premises without obtaining new license. Requires marijuana testing laboratory employee to obtain worker permit from commission. Becomes operative on January 1, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to cannabis; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 117, (2022 Laws): Effective date April 15, 2022. |
2022-04-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed. Ayes, 26; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Carried over to 03-03 by unanimous consent. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Morgan, Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Breese-Iverson. |
2022-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 28, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-02-24 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2022-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-17 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Economic Recovery and Prosperity with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |