OR HB4074 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Health Licensing Office to issue license to practice genetic counseling to qualified applicant. Defines "genetic counseling." Prohibits unlicensed use of "licensed genetic counselor" title and practice of genetic counseling. Provides exemptions to prohibition. Allows office to impose discipline for certain violations. Requires licensed genetic counselor to refer patient as necessary to appropriate licensed health care practitioner for diagnosis and treatment. Requires licensed genetic counselor to practice genetic counseling in culturally and linguistically appropriate manner. Directs office to provide administrative and regulatory oversight to genetic counseling program. Imposes civil penalty for violation of licensure requirements. Becomes operative January 1, 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to genetic counselors; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-21HouseThird reading. Carried by Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 7--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke; Excused, 5--Clem, Greenlick, Hayden, Stark, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 8--Hernandez, McKeown, Nathanson, Noble, Piluso, Speaker Kotek, Sprenger, Witt.
2020-02-20HouseCarried over to February 21, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-19HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-18HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2020-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-11HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Health Care.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback