OR HB4074 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 63, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 13, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 63, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 13, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Board of Medical Imaging to waive specified licensing requirements for individual who meets certain criteria. Specifies that any health care practitioner may order or interpret medical imaging procedure if ordering and interpreting such procedures are properly within practitioner's scope of authority, as determined by agency that licensed practitioner. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to medical imaging; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 63, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 13, 2014. |
2014-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Hicks, Lininger, Lively. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Knopp. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Care and Human Services. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Jenson, Keny-Guyer. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2014-02-10 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-05 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |