OR HB4074 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health promotion.
Title
Relating to health promotion.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2012-02-13 | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. | |
2012-02-13 | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. | |
2012-02-10 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-06 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Revenue. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.state.or.us/MeasureInfo/Measure/AtGlance?session=36&MeasureNumber=HB4074 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/12reg/measures/hb4000.dir/hb4074.intro.html |