OR HB4073 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to peremptory challenges to jurors. Modifies provisions relating to peremptory challenges to jurors. Modifies standard for disqualification of judges. Provides that prosecution in criminal case may not move to disqualify judge solely on basis that prosecution cannot have fair and impartial trial or hearing before judge. Provides that justifiable use of physical force in self-defense or in defending third person is affirmative defense when defendant engaged in, directed or otherwise participated in wrongful conduct that was intended to cause victim to be unavailable as witness, and did cause victim to be unavailable.
Title
Relating to courts.
Sponsors
Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Zach Hudson [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] |
Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] | Rep. Sheri Malstrom Schouten [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2022-02-15 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2022-02-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |