OR HB4073 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-3)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Limits cost-sharing for health benefit plan coverage of insulin prescribed for treatment of diabetes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the cost of insulin.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-21HouseThird reading. Carried by Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 8--Barreto, Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 4--Clem, Greenlick, Hayden, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Hernandez.
2020-02-20HouseCarried over to February 21, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-19HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-18HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2020-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Health Care.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback