OR HB4073 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - In Conference Committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - In Conference Committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds secular organizations and current members of Legislative Assembly to list of persons and entities authorized to solemnize marriages. Adds secular organizations and current members of Legislative Assembly to list of persons and entities authorized to solemnize marriages. Prohibits form of marriage application, license or record from requiring address for person or entity authorized to solemnize marriage. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to solemnization of marriage; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D] | Rep. Mitch Greenlick [D] | Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Rep. John Lively [D] | Rep. Carla Piluso [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House Refuse to Concur (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | In Conference Committee upon adjournment. |
2016-03-02 | House | Representatives Barker, Greenlick, Krieger appointed House conferees. |
2016-03-02 | House | House refused to concur in Senate amendments.Ayes, 51; Nays, 6--Barker, Boone, Frederick, Greenlick, Holvey, Smith Warner; Excused, 3--Davis, Hayden, Olson. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 17; nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 3--Ferrioli, Johnson, Winters. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Motion to refer to Rules failed.Ayes, 10; nays, 17--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney; excused, 3--Ferrioli, Johnson, Winters. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Carried over to 02-29 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-02-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed.Ayes, 35; Nays, 20--Barreto, Bentz, Davis, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, McLane, Nearman, Post, Smith, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Absent, 1--Helm; Excused, 4--Buckley, Buehler, Krieger, Olson. |
2016-02-04 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-02 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |