OR HB4072 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 56, (2022 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 56, (2022 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates one-day angling license. Eliminates one-day angling license. Reduces maximum current and future one-day angling and shellfish license fee established in fee schedule. Provides for temporary partial dedication of one-day angling and shellfish license fee to Oregon Hatchery Research Center Fund. Authorizes State Fish and Wildlife Commission to issue Rogue-South Coast steelhead validation and Rogue-South Coast wild steelhead harvest card. Instructs commission to adopt rules related to validation and harvest card. Provides that moneys received from sale of validation and harvest card shall be credited to Rogue-South Coast Research and Monitoring Subaccount. Establishes Rogue-South Coast Research and Monitoring Subaccount in Fish and Wildlife Account. Provides that moneys in subaccount shall be used for certain research and monitoring.
Title
Relating to authorizations issued by the State Fish and Wildlife Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Chapter 56, (2022 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2023. |
2022-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 26; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Carried over to 03-03 by unanimous consent. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg, Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 2--Hayden, Zika. |
2022-02-28 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Hayden. |
2022-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 28, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-02-24 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2022-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-21 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-17 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2022-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-14 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |