OR HB4072 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Department of Agriculture to administer Oregon Hemp State Program for production, processing and sale of hemp. Changes term "industrial hemp" to "hemp." Requires department to conduct criminal records check of applicants for licensure to grow hemp. Allows department to identify and require by rule licensure for other activities related to hemp. Directs department to establish by rule requirements for shipment manifest for commercial hemp shipments. Becomes operative October 31, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to hemp; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2020-02-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-24 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2020-02-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2020-02-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |