OR HB4071 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-17)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 94, (2016 Laws): Effective date April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-17)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 94, (2016 Laws): Effective date April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes COFA Premium Assistance Program administered by Department of Consumer and Business Services to provide financial assistance with health care premiums and out-of-pocket costs for Pacific Islanders legally residing in Oregon under Compact of Free Association. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health care for Pacific Islanders legally residing in Oregon under a Compact of Free Association; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Chapter 94, (2016 Laws): Effective date April 4, 2016. |
2016-04-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Knopp, Shields, Winters. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-03-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Barnhart, Gilliam, McKeown, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Krieger. |
2016-02-29 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2016-02-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-24 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2016-02-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2016-02-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2016-02-01 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |