OR HB4071 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Historical Society to undertake fund-raising and commissioning of statue of Mark Odom Hatfield, to be placed in National Statuary Hall in United States Capitol. Directs Executive Director of Oregon Historical Society, or designee, to request Architect of Capitol to seek approval of Joint Committee on Library of Congress for replacement of statue of Jason Lee with statue of Mark Odom Hatfield. Directs society to provide for return of Jason Lee statue to suitable location in Salem. Establishes National Statuary Hall Review Task Force to study and make recommendations to retain or replace Oregon's statues in National Statuary Hall Collection. Requires President of Senate and Speaker of House of Representatives to activate task force before task force members can be appointed or task force can take any action. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to placement of statues in National Statuary Hall; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson, Gilliam. Passed.Ayes, 39; Nays, 18--Barton, Buckley, Conger, Holvey, Huffman, Kennemer, McLane, Olson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Tomei, Unger, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Witt; Excused, 2--Davis, Esquivel; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Richardson. |
2014-02-20 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-14 | House | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |