OR HB4070 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1-1)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1-1)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
The Act tells the OHA to adjust its school-based health center grants for inflation. The Act tells the OHA to issue grants and take other actions to increase school-based health services. The Act authorizes lottery bonds for school-based health services. (Flesch Readability Score: 66.4). Directs the Oregon Health Authority to modify the amounts of grants for school-based health centers for inflation. Directs the authority to issue grants for the planning and operation of school-based health services. Directs the authority to develop and implement a program to issue grants to increase and improve school-based mental health services and substance use services. Directs the authority to study methods for providing or increasing reimbursement for mental health services delivered through school-based health centers. Authorizes the issuance of lottery bonds for school-based health center purposes.
Title
Relating to schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - House (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health and Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |