OR HB4070 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to Department of Environmental Quality to award grant for on-site septic system low-interest loan programs and to cover related administrative costs. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to on-site septic system financing; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Water with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |