OR HB4067 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 73, (2016 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 73, (2016 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides affirmative defense to public employee and certain nonprofit employee whistleblowers who provide lawfully accessed information to state or federal regulatory agency, law enforcement agency, manager employed by employer or employee's attorney . Provides affirmative defense to public or nonprofit organization] employee and certain nonprofit employee whistleblowers who provide lawfully accessed information to state or federal regulatory agency, law enforcement agency, member of Legislative Assembly,] manager employed by employer or employee's attorney licensed in Oregon]. Bars affirmative defense if information is disclosed or redisclosed to other party. Bars affirmative defense if information disclosed is stated in commercial exclusive negotiating agreement or commercial nondisclosure agreement involving public or nonprofit employer. Denies affirmative defense if information disclosed relates to individual coworker or supervisor unless information disclosed relates to coworker or supervisor's scope of employment. Provides that attorney or employee of attorney may not assert affirmative defense if information disclosed relates to representation of client. Subjects disclosures to rules of professional conduct. Requires public and nonprofit employers to establish policies for employee whistleblowers and notify employees of whistleblower rights under Act. Requires] Allows attorneys who work for public employers to report violations of law to Attorney General, subject to rules of professional conduct. Provides that information disclosed remains subject to attorney-client privilege and public records law. Acknowledges supremacy of federal law over state law. Creates whistleblower protection for nonprofit employees.] Extends public whistleblower protection to employees of nonprofit organizations that accept public funds. Makes certain violations subject to maximum penalty of one year's imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both. Authorizes court to award civil damages up to $10,000 and punitive damages in addition to existing remedies.] Provides right to jury trial and punitive damages.
Title
Relating to employee whistleblowers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Chapter 73, (2016 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2017. |
2016-03-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--McKeown, Nearman. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 1--Girod; excused, 2--Ferrioli, Winters. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Carried over to 02-29 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-02-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Buehler. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Barton. |
2016-02-16 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2016-02-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |