OR HB4066 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Public Utility Commission to allow electric companies to recover costs from retail electricity consumers for prudent infrastructure measures to support transportation electrification if certain criteria are met. Authorizes Public Utility Commission to allow electric companies to recover costs from retail electricity consumers for prudent investments or expenses in] infrastructure measures that support adoption of electric vehicles] to support transportation electrification if certain criteria are met. Requires electric company participating in clean fuels program to use revenues from sale of certain credits for programs to accelerate transportation electrification. Requires consumer-owned utility to register as credit aggregator and credit generator under clean fuels program and use revenues from sale of credits for programs to support acceleration of transportation electrification. Repeals requirements on January 2, 2026. Requires electric company to have and operate in compliance with risk-based wildfire protection plan approved by commission. Requires submission of first plan no later than December 31, 2020. Requires consumer-owned utility to have and operate in compliance with risk-based wildfire mitigation plan approved by governing body of utility. Requires submission of first plan no later than December 31, 2021. Requires commission to periodically convene workshops to develop and share information for best practices regarding wildfires. Provides that terms and conditions of requirements for risk-based wildfire plans do not affect terms or conditions of easements held by electric utility over private land as of effective date of Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Public Utility Commission; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng Minority) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng bill. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-02-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 17--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Hayden, Moore-Green, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Zika; Excused, 1--Greenlick; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Clem. |
2020-02-19 | House | Carried over to February 20, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2020-02-18 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2020-02-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |