OR HB4066 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 72, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to unmanned aircraft systems, commonly known as drones. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to unmanned aircraft systems; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-01 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-14HouseChapter 72, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 29, 2016.
2016-03-29HouseGovernor signed.
2016-03-04SenatePresident signed.
2016-03-02HouseSpeaker signed.
2016-03-01HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 57; Absent, 1--Boone; Excused, 2--McKeown, Nearman.
2016-02-29SenatePresident Courtney, Riley, Thatcher, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye.
2016-02-29SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 2--Boquist, Girod; excused, 3--Ferrioli, Thomsen, Winters.
2016-02-26SenateCarried over to 02-29 by unanimous consent.
2016-02-25SenateSecond reading.
2016-02-24SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2016-02-23SenateWork Session held.
2016-02-22SenatePublic Hearing held.
2016-02-18SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2016-02-18SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2016-02-17HouseThird reading. Carried by Huffman. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Barton.
2016-02-16HouseSecond reading.
2016-02-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2016-02-10HouseWork Session held.
2016-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2016-02-01HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2016-02-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2016-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2016R1/Measures/Overview/HB4066
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2016R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4066/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2016R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4066/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2016R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4066/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2016R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4066/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2016R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4066/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2016R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4066/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2016R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23825
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2016R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=375872
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2016R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23942
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2016R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=377466
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2016R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=377592

Bill Comments

feedback