OR HB4065 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals driving privilege suspension and eliminates imposition of driving privilege restrictions for failure to pay fine. Becomes operative October 1, 2020. Authorizes Department of Transportation to take certain actions before operative date of Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to driving privileges; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-25SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-20SenatePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-18SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2020-02-18SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-02-18HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Mitchell.
2020-02-18HouseThird reading. Carried by Gorsek, Noble. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 16--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Hayden, Leif, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 2--Clem, Greenlick.
2020-02-17HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-14HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-12HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-05HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback