OR HB4064 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 24, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 24, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows county with large population to use county vehicle registration fee for bridges without distributing portion of fee to cities within county. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to transportation; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Chapter 24, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018. |
2018-03-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Linthicum, Monnes Anderson, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Vial. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 6--Heard, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Lively; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson. |
2018-02-14 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-13 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2018-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2018-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Transportation Policy with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |