OR HB4063 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 91, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 91, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Statutory Common School Fund Loans to identify opportunities for making loans from Common School Fund for purpose of financing projects that provide significant in-state economic benefits. Allows Department of State Lands to make loans from Common School Fund for brownfield redevelopment.Ù Sunsets task force on convening of 2015 regular session of Legislative Assembly. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to loans made from the Common School Fund; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Tobias Read [D] | Rep. Jennifer Williamson [D] |
Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. William Shields [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Chapter 91, (2014 Laws): Effective date April 1, 2014. |
2014-04-01 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 16; nays, 14--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Hass, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Whitsett. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed.Ayes, 37; Nays, 21--Bentz, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Thatcher, Thompson, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner. |
2014-03-04 | House | Second reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-03-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-27 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2014-02-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-26 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2014-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2014-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |