OR HB4062 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires city that provides disability or retirement system for firefighters and police officers by ordinance or charter that is not subject to workers' compensation law to apply provisions requiring presumption that condition or impairment of health is occupational disease that results from employment if firefighter took physical examination upon gaining or during employment that failed to reveal evidence of occupational disease that existed before employment. Requires that city's denial of claim for compensation for occupational disease must be on basis of clear and convincing medical evidence that condition or impairment of health is unrelated to employment. Establishes that time limitations for filing claim are one year from date claimant first discovered or should have discovered occupational disease, one year from date claimant becomes disabled or is informed by physician that claimant is suffering from occupational disease or one year from date that worker's beneficiary first discovered or reasonably should have discovered that cause of worker's death was occupational disease.
Title
Relating to workers' compensation for occupational diseases that certain workers suffer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-02-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 58; Absent, 1--Helm; Excused, 1--Wallan. |
2020-02-11 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2020-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |