OR HB4062 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies standards that State Board of Education must adopt related to student education records. Directs Department of Education to provide technical expertise to assist educational institutions in complying with standards. Directs department to issue privacy risk assessment of any data system, program or contract involving student education records. Requires public body that conducts tests using student information to budget for costs of compliance with standards. Takes effect July 1, 2014.
Title
Relating to student education records; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Rep. Jennifer Williamson [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. William Shields [D] |
Sen. Shemia Fagan [D] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Jessica Pederson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2014-02-12 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/HB4062 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4062/Introduced |