OR HB4061 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 68, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Chapter 68, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to higher education governance; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to higher education governance; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Chapter 68, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2012. | |
2012-03-27 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-06 | President signed. | |
2012-03-06 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-03-02 | Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed. Ayes, 23; nays, 4--Atkinson, Kruse, Shields, Verger; excused, 3--Bates, Boquist, Starr. | |
2012-03-01 | Rules suspended. Second reading. | |
2012-03-01 | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2012-03-01 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-29 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Dembrow,Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 13--Bentz, Berger, Clem, Cowan, Esquivel, Garrard, Gelser, Hunt, Krieger, Smith G., Thatcher, Tomei, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Buckley, Richardson, Speaker Hanna, Speaker Roblan. | |
2012-02-29 | Rules suspended. Second reading. | |
2012-02-29 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2012-02-29 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-28 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2012-02-28 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. | |
2012-02-22 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-15 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-09 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-07 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-02 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Higher Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |