OR HB4060 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies and adds laws related to transportation. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to transportation; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-21HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-19HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-14HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-12HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-07HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Transportation.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback