OR HB4059 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 51, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 51, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Redefines "large-scale project" as "covered project" for purposes of contractor labor standards. Redefines "large-scale project" as "covered project" for purposes of contractor labor standards. Clarifies application of labor standards based on project's capacity rating. Clarifies good faith exception to required total work hours performed by apprentices. Modifies requirement of when person who constructs or repowers covered project shall provide signed attestation or declaration to within 30 days from date construction begins. Exempts contracts and subcontracts with tribal government, agent or instrumentality of Oregon Indian tribe for covered project on tribal lands from contractor labor standards. Requires request for proposals by electric company for resource procurement subject to competitive bidding requirements and that may result in procurement of covered project to include reference to and information regarding contractor labor standards and to require successful bidder to verify provision of attestation, declaration or project labor agreement. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to large-scale project labor standards; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Chapter 51, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 23, 2022. |
2022-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 50; Nays, 9--Bonham, Cate, Hayden, Holvey, Morgan, Reschke, Salinas, Stark, Wallan; Excused, 1--Zika. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 23; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 6--Beyer, Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-14 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Moore-Green. |
2022-02-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 18--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, George, Goodwin, Hayden, Hieb, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Owens, Reschke, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright; Excused, 4--Nelson, Noble, Ruiz, Scharf; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Morgan. |
2022-02-11 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2022-02-09 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |