OR HB4058 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies conditions for requiring, issuing and maintaining in effect surety bond or irrevocable letter of credit for person that creates, attaches, asserts or claims lien in connection with making, altering, repairing, transporting, storing, performing services, supplying materials or performing labor in connection with motor vehicle. Specifies persons that are exempt from requirement to maintain surety bond or irrevocable letter of credit. Becomes operative on July 1, 2020] 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to security for claims of lien in connection with work performed on motor vehicles; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 56; Absent, 1--Fahey; Excused, 3--Clem, Post, Wallan. |
2020-02-14 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2020-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-10 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |