OR HB4058 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Chapter 95, (2012 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Chapter 95, (2012 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to higher education textbooks; and prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to higher education textbooks; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Chapter 95, (2012 Laws): Effective date July 1, 2012. | |
2012-04-11 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-05 | President signed. | |
2012-03-05 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-03-01 | President Courtney declared potential conflict of interest. | |
2012-03-01 | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Atkinson; excused, 1--Starr. | |
2012-02-29 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-29 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-28 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-28 | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2012-02-27 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-27 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-02-27 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-24 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2012-02-24 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-20 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-15 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-09 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2012-02-07 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-02 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Higher Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |