OR HB4057 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Chapter 4, (2022 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Chapter 4, (2022 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds "spray sprinkler bodies" to minimum energy efficiency standards. Adds "spray sprinkler bodies" to minimum energy efficiency standards. Adds "spray sprinkler bodies" to prohibition against sale or installation of products that do not meet minimum energy efficiency standards. Becomes operative January 1, 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to minimum energy efficiency standards; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Chapter 4, (2022 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2022-03-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-02-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 3--Knopp, Linthicum, Thatcher; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 4--Boquist, Girod, Golden, Robinson. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hudson. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 10--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Cate, George, Goodwin, Hieb, Morgan, Reschke, Wallan, Zika; Excused, 2--Noble, Stark. |
2022-02-09 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |