OR HB4054 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Land Use and Wildfire Policy Advisory Committee. Moves provision regarding giving notification of wildfire to forestland owner.] Sunsets advisory committee July 1, 2021. Requires State Forestry Department, Oregon State University and Department of Land Conservation and Development to conduct study of regional wildfire risk within state. Requires departments and advisory committee to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than February 1, 2021, regarding possible means for implementing final recommendations produced by Governor's Council on Wildfire Response. Requires inclusion of regional wildfire risk information in report. Authorizes assignment of council to assist state and local agencies and officials regarding implementation of wildfire risk reduction programs. Requires council to report to Legislative Assembly no later than October 31, 2020, with detailed recommendations regarding sustainable financing model for funding comprehensive wildfire strategy. Requires State Department of Energy to commission study of feasibility of using materials from wildfire fuel reduction projects for renewable energy generation. Requires appointment of advisory committee to assist with study. Requires study to be completed by January 15, 2021. Appropriates moneys to Department of Land Conservation and Development, State Forestry Department, Oregon State University and State Department of Energy for 2019-2021 biennium to carry out Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to wildfires; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2020-02-18HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2020-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Natural Resources.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback