OR HB4053 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 49, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 49, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Transportation to conduct review of Oregon Route 6 and present report to Joint Committee on Transportation no later than September 15, 2023. Requires Department of Transportation to conduct review of Oregon Route 6 and present report to Joint Committee on Transportation no later than September 15, 2023. Sunsets January 2, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to Oregon Route 6; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Chapter 49, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022. |
2022-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Armitage. Passed. Ayes, 23; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 6--Beyer, Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Weber. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Holvey, Nathanson, Speaker Rayfield. |
2022-02-21 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |