OR HB4053 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Removes prohibition against issuing dog license without proof of rabies inoculation. Requires county to make dog license conditional on presentation of proof dog has been inoculated against rabies. Authorizes counties to impose certain conditions or requirements, or] provide other means ,] to verify compliance with dog vaccination requirements. Authorizes county to allow grace period for dog owner to present proof of inoculation or for receipt of other verification of inoculation. Provides exception to county or city acceptance of dog license as proof of inoculation.
Title
Relating to animals.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2020-02-21 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2020-02-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules. |
2020-02-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |