OR HB4052 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 34, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 34, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that electronic record that provides or delivers notice, offer, disclosure, document, form, correspondence, information or other communication required or permitted under insurance laws of this state satisfies requirement for provision or availability to consumer in writing. Provides that if insurer can reliably store and reproduce oral communication or recording of oral communication, oral communication or recording qualifies as notice or document delivered by electronic means. Provides that if proof of mailing of notice is sufficient proof of notice, confirmation of electronic delivery is sufficient proof of notice. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to electronic records used in connection with insurance other than health or life insurance; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 34, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014. |
2014-03-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Shields. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Weidner. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Frederick, Tomei; Excused, 3--Fagan, Hanna, Richardson. |
2014-02-13 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-12 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-07 | House | Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |