OR HB4051 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 47, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 47, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset of Task Force on Homelessness and Racial Disparities until January 2, 2026. Extends sunset of Task Force on Homelessness and Racial Disparities until January 2, 2026. Requires task force to provide interim report by September 15, 2022, and final report by March 31, 2023, on specific pathways for policy changes. Increases appropriation for task force. Extends sunset for special siting provisions for emergency shelters until July 1, 2023. Amends special siting of affordable housing qualifications to be based on ownership of property rather than ownership of housing. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to housing; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Chapter 47, (2022 Laws): Effective date June 3, 2022. |
2022-03-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Jama. Passed. Ayes, 25; Absent, 2--Heard, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-28 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Scharf. |
2022-02-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Campos. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 10--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, George, Goodwin, Levy, Morgan, Scharf, Smith DB, Wallan. |
2022-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 28, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-02-24 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2022-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-22 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-18 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2022-02-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2022-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |