OR HB4049 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Secretary of State to conduct study and analyze best practices for financing electoral campaigns. Requires Secretary of State to conduct study and analyze best practices for financing electoral campaigns. Requires secretary to develop recommendations regarding most effective method for financing electoral campaigns in Oregon. Requires secretary to submit report to interim legislative committees detailing recommendations by September 15, 2023. Sunsets January 2, 2024.
Title
Relating to campaign finance.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2022R1/Measures/Overview/HB4049 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2022R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4049/Introduced |