OR HB4049 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 55, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 55, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of State Police to establish multidisciplinary committee on tracking of sexual assault forensic evidence kits. Directs department to adopt recommendations of committee and to create and maintain statewide electronic sexual assault forensic evidence kit tracking system. Establishes requirements of tracking system. Exempts records and information within tracking system from disclosure as public record. Directs department to, no later than January 1, 2019, report on status of tracking system to Task Force on the Testing of Sexual Assault Forensic Evidence Kits and to Governor and Attorney General. Extends sunset of Task Force on the Testing of Sexual Assault Forensic Evidence Kits to June 30, 2021. Directs task force to monitor implementation of tracking system and to, no later than December 1, 2020, submit to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary final report that includes status update on tracking system. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to sexual assault forensic evidence kits; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Barker [D] | Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] | Rep. Jeff Helfrich [R] | Rep. Susan McLain [D] |
Rep. Julie Parrish [R] | Rep. Carla Piluso [D] | Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Chapter 55, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018. |
2018-04-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2018-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2018-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-26 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2018-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |