OR HB4049 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 1, (2014 Laws): Effective date February 26, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 1, (2014 Laws): Effective date February 26, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts vessel ocean Dungeness crab permits from being subject to revocation or refusal of issuance by State Fish and Wildlife Commission or by court order under certain circumstances. Authorizes Commercial Fishery Permit Board to revoke or refuse subsequent issuance of vessel permit under certain circumstances. Modifies restrictions on transfer of vessel permits. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to vessel ocean Dungeness crab permits; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Krieger [R] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Rep. Deborah Boone [D] |
Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. Douglas Whitsett [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 1, (2014 Laws): Effective date February 26, 2014. |
2014-02-26 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Krieger. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2014-02-05 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-04 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |