OR HB4048 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter 38, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 14, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Reallocates moneys for transportation projects. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to reallocation of moneys for transportation projects; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-24HouseChapter 38, (2016 Laws): Effective date March 14, 2016.
2016-03-14HouseGovernor signed.
2016-02-29SenatePresident signed.
2016-02-26HouseSpeaker signed.
2016-02-24SenateThatcher declared potential conflict of interest.
2016-02-24SenateThird reading. Carried by Riley. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Winters.
2016-02-23SenateCarried over to 02-24 by unanimous consent.
2016-02-22SenateCarried over to 02-23 by unanimous consent.
2016-02-19SenateSecond reading.
2016-02-19SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2016-02-17SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2016-02-12SenateReferred to Business and Transportation.
2016-02-12SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2016-02-11HouseThird reading. Carried by Davis. Passed.Ayes, 60.
2016-02-10HouseRules suspended. Carried over to February 11, 2016 Calendar.
2016-02-09HouseSecond reading.
2016-02-09HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2016-02-08HouseWork Session held.
2016-02-01HousePublic Hearing held.
2016-02-01HouseReferred to Transportation and Economic Development.
2016-02-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2016-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback