OR HB4047 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 18, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 18, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits education service districts from imposing high school diploma requirements that are in addition to requirements established by state law if child is enrolled in educational program under Juvenile Detention Education Program or Youth Corrections Education Program.
Title
Relating to high school diploma requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Chapter 18, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019. |
2018-03-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bynum, Vial. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Nearman. |
2018-02-07 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Education. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |