OR HB4042 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 93, (2016 Laws): Effective date April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter 93, (2016 Laws): Effective date April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates general assistance project administered by Department of Human Services. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to general assistance; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Chapter 93, (2016 Laws): Effective date April 4, 2016. |
2016-04-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Shields, Winters. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-03-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer, Stark. Passed.Ayes, 54; Absent, 1--Hoyle; Excused, 4--Barnhart, Gilliam, McKeown, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Krieger. |
2016-02-29 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2016-02-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-24 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2016-02-24 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2016-02-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2016-02-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2016-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |