OR HB4042 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 33, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 33, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds renewable marine energy to types of energy for which availability of net metering is required.
Title
Relating to net metering of energy produced by marine resources.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 33, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015. |
2014-03-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Boquist declared potential conflict of interest. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Rural Communities and Economic Development. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Boone. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley. |
2014-02-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 11, 2014 Calendar. |
2014-02-06 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-04 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |