OR HB4040 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Judicial Department to establish Family Treatment Court Program in certain counties to improve outcomes in child welfare cases resulting from parent's or caregiver's alleged substance use disorder. Directs Public Defense Services Commission to develop and maintain Parent-Child Representation Program for delivery of legal services to certain persons participating in Family Treatment Court Program. Appropriates moneys to Judicial Department and Department of Human Services for purposes related to Family Treatment Court Program. Appropriates moneys to Public Defense Services Commission for purposes related to Parent-Child Representation Program. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to family treatment courts; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-14HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-12HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-05HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback