OR HB4040 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon State Lottery Commission to balance its obligation to maximize net revenues with its obligation to serve public good. Requires lottery commission to adopt comprehensive responsible gaming policy that integrates consideration of responsible playing of games of chance into lottery operations.
Title
Relating to the Oregon State Lottery.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Tomei. Passed.Ayes, 44; Nays, 16--Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Krieger, McLane, Smith, Sprenger, Weidner, Whitsett. |
2014-02-10 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-05 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |