OR HB4039 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Human Services to conduct statewide assessment of needs of and services for unaccompanied homeless youth in Oregon. Authorizes department to award one-year grants to organizations that provide services to unaccompanied homeless youth and to organizations that operate host home projects for unaccompanied homeless youth. Sunsets grant programs on July 1, 2021. Requires department to report on host home projects established through use of grants to committees of Legislative Assembly relating to housing, homeless youth services and high school education no later than September 15, 2021. Appropriates moneys to Department of Human Services for services provided to unaccompanied homeless youth.] Appropriates moneys to department for statewide assessment and grants. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to homeless youth; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-27HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-27HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-24HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2020-02-24HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-18HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2020-02-17HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-17HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-12HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback