OR HB4038 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 91, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 91, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Director of Veterans' Affairs to study progress of establishment of Roseburg Oregon Veterans' Home. Prohibits sale or destruction of military medals and decorations by Department of State Lands. Permits Department of State Lands to deliver military medals and decorations to certain custodians. Directs Director of Veterans' Affairs to identify potential sites for veterans' cemeteries. Establishes program to provide outreach and assistance to incarcerated veterans. Expands definition of "disabled veteran" for preference in public employment to include person receiving service-connected disability pension from United States Department of Veterans Affairs who does not otherwise meet state definition of "veteran." Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to military service members; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Chapter 91, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2018. |
2018-04-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Hayden; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Kennemer. |
2018-03-03 | House | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2018-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |