OR HB4038 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Chapter 89, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions that establish process for tenants of manufactured dwelling park to purchase park. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.Ù.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to tenant purchase of residential facility.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-08HouseChapter 89, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
2014-04-01HouseGovernor signed.
2014-03-07SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-05HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Berger, Conger, Weidner.
2014-03-04SenateThird reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2014-03-03SenateSecond reading.
2014-02-28SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2014-02-27SenateWork Session held.
2014-02-25SenateMotion to refer to Rules carried on voice vote.
2014-02-24SenateTaken from 02-24 Calendar and placed on 02-25 Calendar on voice vote.
2014-02-21SenateTaken from 02-21 Calendar and placed on 02-24 Calendar on voice vote.
2014-02-20SenateSecond reading.
2014-02-19SenateMinority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng Minority)
2014-02-19SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng bill.
2014-02-17SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-13SenateReferred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection.
2014-02-12SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2014-02-11HouseThird reading. Carried by Nathanson, Whisnant. Passed.Ayes, 60.
2014-02-10HouseSecond reading.
2014-02-10HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2014-02-05HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-03HousePublic Hearing held.
2014-02-03HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing.
2014-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/HB4038
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4038/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4038/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4038/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4038/Senate%20Minority%20Report%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4038/Minority%20Report%20B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4038/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4038/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4038/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/19920
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=316027
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20105
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20222
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318736
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318881

Bill Comments

feedback