OR HB4038 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to tax credits; prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to tax credits; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2012-02-15 | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. | |
2012-02-15 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. | |
2012-02-14 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-02 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Energy, Environment and Water with subsequent referral to Revenue. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |