OR HB4037 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 31, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 31, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes county sheriff to designate county juvenile department or Oregon Youth Authority to provide direct transfer of juvenile offenders to youth correction facility as part of agreement with Department of Corrections or supervisory authority of county. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to juvenile offenders; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 31, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 6, 2014. |
2014-03-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Barton. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Hanna, Richardson. |
2014-02-14 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |