OR HB4032 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Health Authority for expenses related to hospital nurse staffing program. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] |
Rep. Andrea Salinas [D] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |